SJR1
Introduced in the Senate on Jan 23, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Parks

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to replace the State Board of Pardons Commissioners with the Clemency Board and to require the Legislature to provide for the organization and duties of the Clemency Board. (BDR C-552)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
File No. 80.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 19, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 12, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr. 30, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     May. 12, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 13   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 19   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.46   

Bill History

Jan 23, 2009

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Jan 26, 2009

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 30, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 01, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 46.) To printer.

Apr 02, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 06, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 08, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 13, 2009

Apr 14, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To committee.

May 13, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 15, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 16, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 19, 2009

May 20, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 22, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • File No. 80.
  • (Return to 2011 Session)