ACR2
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 09, 2009.
By: Education

Directs the Legislative Commission to conduct an interim study concerning the governance and oversight of the system of public education. (BDR R-301)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government:
Effect on State:

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
File No. 89.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 08, 2009     02:30 PM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     May. 05, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     May. 12, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          Be adopted
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 21, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Be adopted
  Senate Finance     May. 29, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          After Passage Discussion

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Feb 09, 2009

  • Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To printer.

Feb 10, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

May 13, 2009

  • From committee: Be adopted.
  • Placed on Resolution File.
  • Resolution read and adopted. To Senate.

May 15, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

May 21, 2009

  • From committee: Be adopted.
  • Placed on Resolution File.
  • Resolution read and adopted. To Assembly.

May 22, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • File No. 89.