AB150
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 10, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Koivisto , McClain , Conklin , Bobzien , Dondero Loop , Kihuen , Ohrenschall

Provides for the regulation of tanning establishments by the State Board of Cosmetology. (BDR 54-491)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 11, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 10, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 10, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 11, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 02, 2009

  • Notice of exemption.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Amended Notice of Exemption: Eligible for Exemption.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)