AB155
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 11, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Munford , Denis , Segerblom , Bobzien , Ohrenschall , Pierce

Enacts provisions related to multicultural education. (BDR 34-142)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Feb. 23, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Education     Apr. 08, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.335   

Bill History

Feb 11, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Feb 12, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 335.) To printer.

Apr 15, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

Apr 22, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)