AB177
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Oceguera

Revises provisions concerning short-term leases of passenger cars. (BDR 43-194)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 152.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Feb. 26, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Apr. 16, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Apr. 22, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 10   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 12   Yea 19,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.21     Amend. No.568   

Bill History

Feb 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Feb 17, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 09, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 21.) To printer.

Apr 10, 2009

Apr 13, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To committee.

Apr 30, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 01, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 568.) To printer.

May 02, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 04, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 05, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 06, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 08, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 11, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 12, 2009

May 13, 2009

  • In Assembly.

May 15, 2009

  • Senate Amendment No. 568 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 17, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 22, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 152.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.