AB178
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Claborn

Makes various changes to provisions relating to industrial insurance. (BDR 53-221)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb. 27, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 11, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 10, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Without recommendation, and rerefer
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 04, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 17, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 02, 2009

  • Notice of exemption.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Amended Notice of Exemption: Eligible for Exemption.

Apr 13, 2009

  • From committee: Without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 15, 2009

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)