AB203
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 19, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy , Buckley , Gansert , Smith , Bobzien , Aizley , Arberry , Cobb , Denis , Dondero Loop , Goedhart , Goicoechea , Grady , Gustavson , Hambrick , Kirkpatrick , Manendo , McArthur , Oceguera , Ohrenschall , Pierce , Settelmeyer , Spiegel , Stewart , Woodbury , Hardy , Parks , Cegavske , Lee

Revises provisions relating to state financial administration. (BDR 31-129)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar. 04, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 19, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Feb 20, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 16, 2009

  • Notice of exemption.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)