AB213
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 25, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Anderson , Conklin , Horne , Kihuen , Parnell , Arberry , Atkinson , Carpenter , Dondero Loop , Gustavson , Hambrick , Kirkpatrick , Manendo , McArthur , McClain , Mortenson , Ohrenschall , Segerblom , Settelmeyer , Cegavske

Requires the establishment of the Cancer Drug Donation Program. (BDR 40-39)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 122.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar. 30, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr. 01, 2009     01:00 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr. 08, 2009     01:00 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 22, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass, as amended
  Senate Health and Education     May. 01, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 23   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 12   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.459     Amend. No.329   

Bill History

Feb 25, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Feb 26, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 16, 2009

  • Notice of exemption.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Amended Notice of Exemption: Eligible for Exemption.

Apr 14, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 329 and 459.) To printer.

Apr 15, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Apr 22, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.

Apr 23, 2009

Apr 24, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To committee.

May 02, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 04, 2009

  • Read second time.

May 05, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 06, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 08, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 11, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 12, 2009

May 13, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 15, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 19, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 122.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.