AB214
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 25, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Parnell

Revises provisions regarding industrial injuries and occupational diseases. (BDR 53-25)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 433.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Feb. 26, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 04, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 10, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 29, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 27, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May. 29, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     May. 30, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 28   Yea 38,   Nay 3,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 30   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.956   

Bill History

Feb 25, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 26, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 16, 2009

  • Notice of exemption.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Amended Notice of Exemption: Eligible for Exemption.

Mar 27, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 30, 2009

  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 28, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 956.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 3, Excused: 1.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.

May 30, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 01, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 03, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 433.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.