AB224
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 02, 2009.
By: Commerce and Labor

Revises provisions relating to unfair practices in settling insurance claims. (BDR 57-923)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 02, 2009     11:23 AM    Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 18, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 10, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 24, 2009     12:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 15, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 20   Yea 27,   Nay 14,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.436   

Bill History

Mar 02, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 03, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 436.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 14, Excused: 1.)
  • To printer.

Apr 21, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)