AB229
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 03, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Oceguera , Conklin , Aizley , Atkinson , Bobzien , Dondero Loop , Hogan , Kihuen , Manendo , McClain , Mortenson , Pierce , Segerblom , Spiegel , Parks

Enacts provisions governing fire-safe cigarettes. (BDR 42-568)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 435.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar. 30, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr. 03, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 27, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 27, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass, as amended
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 18, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 27, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 29   Yea 33,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 28   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.198     Amend. No.960   

Bill History

Mar 03, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 04, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 16, 2009

  • Notice of exemption.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Amended Notice of Exemption: Eligible for Exemption.

Apr 16, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 198.) To printer.

Apr 17, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Apr 28, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.

Apr 29, 2009

Apr 30, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs.
  • Action of referral rescinded.
  • Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 28, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 960.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 29, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 960 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 01, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 03, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 435.
  • Sections 1, 14, 20 and 21 of this act effective June 3, 2009. Sections 2 to 13, inclusive, and 15 to 19, inclusive, of this act effective 1 year after June 3, 2009. Sections 2 to 16 and 21, inclusive, 18, 19 and 20 of this act expire by limitation on the date upon which a federal law establishing standards for fire-safe cigarettes becomes effective.