AB235
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 04, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy , Goicoechea , Aizley , Grady , Koivisto , Smith , Stewart

Makes various changes to provisions governing the taxation of certain fuels and special fuels. (BDR 32-897)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Mar. 17, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Transportation     Apr. 02, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Taxation     May. 07, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Taxation     May. 15, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 20   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.194   

Bill History

Mar 04, 2009

  • Read first time.
  • Referred to Committee on Taxation.
  • Action of referral rescinded.
  • Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 05, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 16, 2009

  • Notice of exemption.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Amended Notice of Exemption: Eligible for Exemption.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 194.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.

Apr 21, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.

May 23, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)