AB243
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 05, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Mastroluca , Parnell , Denis , Smith , Anderson , Atkinson , Bobzien , Dondero Loop , Hardy , Kirkpatrick , Stewart , Woodbury , Woodhouse , Copening

Requires certain employers to grant leave to parents, guardians and custodians of children to participate in certain school activities. (BDR 34-670)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 292.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Mar. 23, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Education     Mar. 30, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 22, 2009     03:15 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     May. 07, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Apr. 15   Yea 39,   Nay 3,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May. 20   Yea 15,   Nay 6,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.152     Amend. No.478     Amend. No.628   

Bill History

Mar 05, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 06, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 152.) To printer.

Apr 07, 2009

Apr 09, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 10, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 13, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 14, 2009

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 478.) To printer.

Apr 15, 2009

Apr 16, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To committee.

May 11, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 12, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 628.) To printer.

May 13, 2009

May 15, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 16, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

May 20, 2009

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 15, Nays: 6.) To Assembly.

May 21, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 628 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 22, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 292.
  • Effective August 15, 2009.