AB245
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 05, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Stewart , Hardy , Gansert , Carpenter , Goedhart , Goicoechea , Grady , Gustavson , McArthur , Munford , Settelmeyer , Woodbury

Revises certain provisions relating to voter identification. (BDR 24-577)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 05, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To printer.

Mar 06, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 16, 2009

  • Notice of exemption.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Amended Notice of Exemption: Eligible for Exemption.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)