AB248
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 05, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Segerblom , Buckley , Oceguera , Horne , Conklin , Anderson , Kirkpatrick , Mortenson

Revises provisions governing holding companies. (BDR 57-997)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 333.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 16, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 22, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 24, 2009     12:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar. 27   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 12   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.574   

Bill History

Mar 05, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 06, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 17, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 18, 2009

  • Read second time.

Mar 19, 2009

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 24, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 27, 2009

Mar 30, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 01, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 02, 2009

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

May 04, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 574.) To printer.

May 05, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 06, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 08, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 11, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 12, 2009

May 13, 2009

  • In Assembly.

May 22, 2009

  • Senate Amendment No. 574 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 23, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 29, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 333.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.