AB252
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 05, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Anderson , Horne , Smith , Hardy , Aizley , Buckley , Carpenter , Conklin , Goedhart , Goicoechea , Hambrick , Kirkpatrick , McArthur , Segerblom

Provides for the waiver of fees for the issuance of certain forms of identifying information for certain persons. (BDR 40-521)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Corrections, Parole, and Probation     Mar. 19, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Corrections, Parole, and Probation     Apr. 09, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.366   

Bill History

Mar 05, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Corrections, Parole, and Probation. To printer.

Mar 06, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 17, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 366.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 22, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)