AB256
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 06, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Segerblom , McClain , Aizley , Claborn , Mortenson , Munford , Ohrenschall , Pierce , Breeden

Revises provisions governing the dates for certain elections. (BDR 24-713)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Mar. 31, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr. 09, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.403   

Bill History

Mar 06, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To printer.

Mar 09, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 403.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time.
  • To printer.

Apr 21, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 22, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)