AB266
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 09, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Oceguera

Prohibits the sale of novelty lighters. (BDR 52-569)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Bill became law pursuant to Article 4, Section 35 of Nevada Constitution.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 30, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 29, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 13, 2009     12:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr. 13   Yea 28,   Nay 12,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 21   Yea 16,   Nay 5,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.697   

Bill History

Mar 09, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 10, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 02, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 06, 2009

  • Read second time.

Apr 09, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 10, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 13, 2009

Apr 14, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 19, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 20, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 697.) To printer.

May 21, 2009

May 22, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 697 concurred in. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 29, 2009

  • Chapter 323.
  • (Bill became law pursuant to Article 4, Section 35 of Nevada Constitution.)
  • Effective January 1, 2010.