AB267
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 09, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Segerblom

Requires certain golf courses assessed as open-space real property to be designated as open-space real property under applicable zoning ordinances. (BDR 32-640)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Nevada Constitution, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Mar. 24, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Taxation     Apr. 09, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Taxation     Apr. 28, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Taxation     May. 12, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Taxation     May. 15, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 21   Yea 31,   Nay 10,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 19   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0

Votes in Response to Governor's Veto  (2/3 Majority Required)
   Senate Override (Not Sustain)    (1st Reprint)       Jun. 01   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Override (Not Sustain)    (1st Reprint)       Jun. 01   Yea 29,   Nay 13,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0

Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.412   

Bill History

Mar 09, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 10, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 412.) To printer.

Apr 15, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 16, 2009

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 21, 2009

Apr 22, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 18, 2009

  • Read second time.

May 19, 2009

May 20, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 22, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2009

  • Vetoed by the Governor.

May 30, 2009

  • Returned to Assembly.

Jun 01, 2009

  • Bill read. Veto not sustained. (Yeas: 29, Nays: 13.)
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Made Special Order of Business for Monday, June 1, 2009, at 10:20 p.m.
  • Bill read. Veto sustained. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.)
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • (Pursuant to Nevada Constitution, no further action allowed.)