AB275
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 10, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Gansert

Revises the provisions governing certain taxes imposed on financial institutions. (BDR 32-38)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Mar. 19, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 10, 2009

  • Read first time.
  • Referred to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Action of referral rescinded.
  • Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 11, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 16, 2009

  • Notice of exemption.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Amended Notice of Exemption: Eligible for Exemption.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)