AB281
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 10, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Conklin

Makes various changes concerning workers' compensation. (BDR 53-57)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 297.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 06, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 08, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 29, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 15, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 20   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 22   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.278     Amend. No.766   

Bill History

Mar 10, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 11, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 278.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.)
  • To printer.

Apr 21, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 21, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 766.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .

May 22, 2009

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 766 concurred in. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 297.
  • Sections 1 to 6, and 12, inclusive, 10 and 11 of this act effective July 1, 2009. Sections 7, 8, and 9 of this act effective October 1, 2009.