AB297
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 11, 2009.
By: Transportation

Enacts provisions governing tied body shops. (BDR 43-718)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Mar. 10, 2009     04:00 PM    Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Transportation     Mar. 19, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Transportation     Apr. 09, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr. 21   Yea 31,   Nay 10,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 11, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 12, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 10, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Apr 13, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 14, 2009

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 21, 2009

Apr 22, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)