AB300
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 11, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Gustavson , Carpenter , Cobb , Goedhart , Goicoechea , Hambrick , McArthur , Mortenson , Munford , Ohrenschall , Settelmeyer , Amodei , Lee , Washington

Revises provisions governing the wearing of protective headgear when operating motorcycles. (BDR 43-735)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar. 17, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Assembly Transportation     Mar. 24, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 11, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 12, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)