SB207
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 11, 2009.
By: Commerce and Labor

Revises provisions relating to unlawful discrimination in places of public accommodation. (BDR 54-738)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 195.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 16, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 27, 2009     12:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 30, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 01, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr. 08   Yea 19,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May. 15   Yea 37,   Nay 3,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 11, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 12, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 01, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 02, 2009

  • Read second time.

Apr 06, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 08, 2009

Apr 09, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 06, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 08, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 12, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 13, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 15, 2009

May 16, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 18, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 22, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 195.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.