SB208
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 11, 2009.
By: Commerce and Labor

Authorizes public utilities and local government franchisees to increase their rates to account for a legislative change in the rate of the payroll tax imposed upon certain businesses. (BDR S-1142)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Taxation     Mar. 19, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Taxation     Apr. 09, 2009     12:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Finance     Apr. 10, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     May. 27, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May. 30, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 31   Yea 19,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 1


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.983   

Bill History

Mar 11, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 12, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 13, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 14, 2009

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 31, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 983.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 1, Absent: 1.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)