SB210
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 13, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Lee

Makes various changes to the provisions governing the disposition and reporting of campaign contributions. (BDR 24-582)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar. 24, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Reschedule
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar. 26, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr. 09, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     May. 07, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 30, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          After Passage Discussion

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 21   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.384   

Bill History

Mar 13, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 16, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 21, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 384.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Apr 22, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)