SB211
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 13, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Woodhouse , Carlton , Breeden , Copening , Horsford , Lee , Parks , Schneider

Enacts provisions relating to manufacturers and wholesalers of prescription drugs. (BDR 54-1056)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 23, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 03, 2009     12:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 08, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Not Heard

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 13, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 16, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)