SJR6
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 13, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Woodhouse , Horsford , Parks , Breeden , Copening , Schneider

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to provide for a 30-day legislative session in even-numbered years to consider budgetary matters. (BDR C-107)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar. 31, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 14, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 13, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 16, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)