SB212
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 13, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Rhoads

Revises provisions governing initiative petitions. (BDR 24-649)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 460.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar. 26, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr. 09, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May. 27, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May. 30, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     May. 31, 2009     10:45 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 31   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun. 01   Yea 41,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.984     Amend. No.996     Amend. No.1002   

Bill History

Mar 13, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 16, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 26, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 16, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Apr 21, 2009

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 31, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 984 and 996.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To committee.

Jun 01, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1002.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: 1.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 1002 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 02, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 04, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 460.
  • Effective June 4, 2009.