SB214
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 13, 2009.
By: Commerce and Labor

Revises provisions governing plans for dental care and prepaid limited health service organizations. (BDR 57-291)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 25, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 27, 2009     12:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr. 08   Yea 8,   Nay 13,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 13, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 16, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 30, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 01, 2009

  • Read second time.

Apr 02, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 06, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 08, 2009

Apr 22, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)