AB307
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 12, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Aizley , Bobzien , Ohrenschall , Dondero Loop , Grady , Hogan , Mastroluca , McClain , Segerblom , Amodei

Revises provisions governing the publication of certain information relating to property taxes. (BDR 32-714)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Mar. 24, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Taxation     Apr. 30, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Taxation     May. 12, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 20   Yea 31,   Nay 10,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 18   Yea 17,   Nay 4,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.98     Amend. No.682   

Bill History

Mar 12, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 13, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 98.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 31, Nays: 10, Excused: 1.)
  • To printer.

Apr 21, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.

May 15, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 16, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 682.) To printer.

May 18, 2009

May 19, 2009

  • In Assembly.

May 20, 2009

  • Senate Amendment No. 682 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 22, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2009

  • Vetoed by the Governor.

May 30, 2009

  • Returned to Assembly.
  • Bill read.

Jun 01, 2009

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)