SB218
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 13, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Parks , Coffin , Care , Nolan , Horsford , Breeden , Copening , Lee , Schneider , Wiener , Woodhouse , Spiegel , Atkinson , Koivisto , Anderson , Bobzien , Claborn , Manendo , Mastroluca , McClain , Ohrenschall , Pierce , Segerblom , Settelmeyer , Stewart

Revises certain provisions governing fees charged and duties performed by constables and revises certain provisions relating to motor vehicle registration. (BDR 20-846)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 498.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Taxation     Mar. 24, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Taxation     Apr. 02, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Apr. 21, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Transportation     May. 05, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     May. 11, 2009     09:30 AM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Transportation     May. 14, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Taxation     May. 22, 2009     12:27 AM    Minutes          Do not concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 15   Yea 19,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May. 20   Yea 39,   Nay 3,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.445     Amend. No.742     Amend. No.881   

Bill History

Mar 13, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 16, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 08, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 13, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 445.) To printer.

Apr 14, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 15, 2009

Apr 16, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs.
  • Action of referral rescinded.
  • Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 742.) To printer.

May 18, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 20, 2009

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 881.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 3.)
  • To printer.

May 21, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.

May 22, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment Nos. 742 and 881 not concurred in. To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 881 and 742 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.
  • In Senate.

May 23, 2009

  • Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.

May 28, 2009

  • From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment Nos. 742 and 881.
  • Conference report adopted by Senate.

May 30, 2009

  • Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • To enrollment.

Jun 01, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 09, 2009

  • Chapter 498.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.