AJR6
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 12, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Segerblom , Ohrenschall , Koivisto , Buckley , McClain , Aizley , Anderson , Arberry , Atkinson , Claborn , Denis , Goicoechea , Hogan , Horne , Kihuen , Manendo , Mastroluca , Mortenson , Munford , Oceguera , Pierce , Settelmeyer , Smith , Horsford , Coffin , Schneider , Breeden , Hardy , Woodhouse

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to revise provisions concerning legislative sessions. (BDR C-67)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Mar. 19, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr. 09, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 05, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 14, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 14   Yea 29,   Nay 12,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.401     Amend. No.756   

Bill History

Mar 12, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To printer.

Mar 13, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 13, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 401.) To printer.

Apr 14, 2009

Apr 15, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

May 21, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 756.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)