SB223
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 13, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Wiener

Revises the provisions relating to certain crimes involving credit cards and debit cards. (BDR 15-73)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 63.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 19, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 27, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar. 25   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May. 01   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 13, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 16, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 19, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Read second time.

Mar 24, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 25, 2009

Mar 27, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Apr 28, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 29, 2009

  • Read second time.

May 01, 2009

May 02, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 05, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 11, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 63.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.