SB224
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 13, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Care

Revises provisions concerning voting by members of certain public bodies. (BDR 19-675)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar. 25, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr. 01, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Government Affairs     May. 01, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr. 08   Yea 14,   Nay 7,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 13, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 16, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 02, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 06, 2009

  • Read second time.

Apr 08, 2009

Apr 09, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)