SB228
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 13, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Carlton

Revises provisions governing the ownership or operation of a dental office or clinic. (BDR 54-651)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 262.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 03, 2009     12:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 08, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 27, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 15, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 20, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr. 15   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 19   Yea 37,   Nay 4,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.781   

Bill History

Mar 13, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 16, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 13, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 14, 2009

  • Read second time.

Apr 15, 2009

Apr 16, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 18, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 781.) To printer.

May 19, 2009

May 20, 2009

  • In Senate.

May 21, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment No. 781 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 22, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 262.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.