AB322
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 13, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hogan , Manendo , McClain , Aizley , Arberry , Bobzien , Cobb , Denis , Goedhart , Goicoechea , Hambrick , Mastroluca

Makes various changes concerning conduct related to racketeering. (BDR 15-1000)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 49.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 20, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 15, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 24, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar. 27   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 30   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.577   

Bill History

Mar 13, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 16, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 20, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Read second time.

Mar 24, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 27, 2009

Mar 30, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Apr 24, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 28, 2009

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Apr 29, 2009

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 577.) To printer.

Apr 30, 2009

May 01, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 577 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 02, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 06, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 49.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.