SB233
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 13, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Woodhouse , Breeden , Wiener , Parks , Horsford , Care , Coffin , Mathews , Schneider

Revises provisions relating to immunizations. (BDR 40-105)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation not included in Executive Budget.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 03, 2009     01:00 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 08, 2009     02:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and rerefer

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.300   

Bill History

Mar 13, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To printer.

Mar 16, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 31, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and rerefer to Committee on Finance.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 300.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 21, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)