SB234
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 13, 2009.
By: Taxation

Makes various changes concerning the short-term leasing of passenger cars. (BDR 43-33)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 390.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Taxation     Mar. 26, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Taxation     Apr. 07, 2009     12:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May. 18, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 19, 2009     09:30 AM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 18   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 1
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 20   Yea 34,   Nay 8,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0

Votes in Response to Governor's Veto  (2/3 Majority Required)
   Senate Override (Not Sustain)    (2nd Reprint)       May. 30   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Override (Not Sustain)    (2nd Reprint)       May. 31   Yea 34,   Nay 8,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0

Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.263     Amend. No.841   

Bill History

Mar 13, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 16, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 17, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 263.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 21, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 18, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 841.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Absent: 1.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

May 19, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 20, 2009

May 21, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 22, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2009

  • Vetoed by the Governor. Returned to Senate with Governor's veto message.

May 30, 2009

  • Made Special Order of Business for Saturday, May 30, 2009, at 6:42 p.m.
  • Bill read. Veto not sustained. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.

May 31, 2009

Jun 01, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • Chapter 390.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.