AB326
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 13, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Denis

Revises provisions governing controlled substances. (BDR 40-558)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 301.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar. 30, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr. 01, 2009     01:00 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr. 08, 2009     01:00 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Education     May. 11, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     May. 11, 2009     03:15 PM    Minutes          Discussed in Subcommittee
  Senate Health and Education     May. 13, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 17   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 19   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.471   

Bill History

Mar 13, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 16, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 16, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 471.) To printer.

Apr 17, 2009

Apr 20, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 18, 2009

  • Read second time.

May 19, 2009

May 20, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 22, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 301.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.