AB328
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 13, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Settelmeyer , Goedhart , Christensen , Anderson , Cobb , Gustavson , Hambrick , Kirkpatrick , Pierce , Stewart , Woodbury , Amodei , Hardy , Raggio

Provides for an abatement of the ad valorem taxes levied on a single-family residence purchased by a first-time homeowner at a foreclosure sale. (BDR 32-164)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Apr. 02, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 13, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 16, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.
  • Notice of exemption.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Amended Notice of Exemption: Eligible for Exemption.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)