SB242
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 13, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Schneider

Enacts provisions relating to energy efficiency. (BDR 58-378)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Mar. 19, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Apr. 07, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Apr. 17, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Senate Finance     Apr. 29, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     May. 16, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Senate Finance     May. 19, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 28, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 29, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 21   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May. 30   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.485     Amend. No.861     Amend. No.978   

Bill History

Mar 13, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To printer.

Mar 16, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 26, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 14, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 15, 2009

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Apr 16, 2009

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 485.) To printer.

Apr 17, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 19, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 20, 2009

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 861.) To printer.

May 21, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 30, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 978.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.)
  • To printer.

May 31, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 978 not concurred in. To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 978 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.

Jun 01, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)