AB332
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 13, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Dondero Loop , Buckley , Manendo , Smith , Conklin , Aizley , Anderson , Arberry , Atkinson , Bobzien , Claborn , Denis , Goicoechea , Kirkpatrick , Koivisto , Leslie , McClain , Munford , Oceguera , Segerblom , Settelmeyer , Spiegel , Stewart , Woodbury

Revises provisions governing immunity from liability for donating, receiving or distributing certain grocery products or food. (BDR 3-1017)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 50.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar. 25, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 24, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr. 13   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr. 30   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 13, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 16, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 27, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 30, 2009

  • Read second time.

Mar 31, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 01, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 02, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 06, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 09, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 10, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 13, 2009

Apr 14, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Apr 28, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 29, 2009

  • Read second time.

Apr 30, 2009

May 01, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 02, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 06, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 50.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.