AB337
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 13, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Leslie

Creates the Office of Statewide Coordinator for Children Who Are Endangered by Drug Exposure in the Office of the Attorney General. (BDR 38-593)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 340.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar. 23, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar. 25, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Without recommendation, and rerefer
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 08, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 27, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 29, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Government Affairs     May. 18, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     May. 20, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 06   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 22   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.592   

Bill History

Mar 13, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 16, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.
  • Notice of exemption.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Amended Notice of Exemption: Eligible for Exemption.

Mar 27, 2009

  • From committee: Without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 02, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 05, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 592.) To printer.

May 06, 2009

May 08, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 21, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Read second time.

May 22, 2009

May 23, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 29, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 340.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.