AB345
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 13, 2009.
By: Taxation

Makes various changes concerning certain exemptions from property taxes and governmental services taxes. (BDR 32-101)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Mar. 13, 2009     11:35 AM    Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Taxation     Apr. 02, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Taxation     Apr. 09, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended and rerefer
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 04, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          Not Heard
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 13, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.413   

Bill History

Mar 13, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 16, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.
  • Notice of exemption.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Amended Notice of Exemption: Eligible for Exemption.

Apr 17, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 413.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)