SB245
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Lee

Makes various changes relating to regional transportation commissions. (BDR 22-585)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 223.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar. 30, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr. 03, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr. 06, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr. 08, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Rescind previous action on: 4-06-09   Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Transportation     May. 05, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Transportation     May. 14, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Government Affairs     May. 22, 2009     04:36 PM    Minutes          Concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 20   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 21   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.231     Amend. No.902   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 17, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 17, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 231.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2009

Apr 21, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 19, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 20, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 21, 2009

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 902.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.)
  • To printer.

May 22, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 902 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 23, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 26, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 223.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.