SB255
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Schneider

Provides for a partial abatement of the ad valorem taxes imposed on certain residential rental dwellings. (BDR 32-65)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Taxation     Apr. 02, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Taxation     Apr. 09, 2009     12:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 17, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 01, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 13, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 14, 2009

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)