SB258
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Cegavske , Amodei , Care , Hardy , Lee , Mathews , McGinness , Schneider , Washington , Gansert , Mortenson , Carpenter , Christensen , Claborn , Cobb , Hambrick , Hogan , Manendo , Munford , Settelmeyer , Stewart

Requires owners of industrial or commercial buildings to make certain disclosures. (BDR 58-790)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Mar. 20, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Mar. 27, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To printer.

Mar 17, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 22, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)