AB359
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Woodbury , Hardy , Gansert , Ohrenschall , Aizley , Atkinson , Bobzien , Christensen , Claborn , Denis , Dondero Loop , Goedhart , Goicoechea , Hambrick , Hogan , Kihuen , Kirkpatrick , Manendo , Munford , Oceguera , Pierce , Settelmeyer , Spiegel , Stewart , Breeden , Schneider , Woodhouse

Revises provisions governing certain personnel who work with children with autism. (BDR 34-1024)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 342.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Mar. 25, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          Amend, without recommendation, and rerefer
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr. 06, 2009     01:00 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr. 08, 2009     01:00 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 22, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 04, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 06, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Education     May. 20, 2009     02:15 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May. 13   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May. 22   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.112     Amend. No.288     Amend. No.634   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 17, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 01, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Health and Human Services.

Apr 02, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 112.) Rereferred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Apr 03, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.

Apr 06, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 14, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 288.) To printer.

Apr 15, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 12, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 634.) To printer.

May 13, 2009

May 15, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To committee.

May 20, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 21, 2009

  • Read second time.

May 22, 2009

May 23, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 29, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 342.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.