AB360
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Goicoechea , Gustavson , Settelmeyer

Authorizes the temporary creation of certain special districts. (BDR 25-733)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 305.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar. 25, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr. 08, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Government Affairs     May. 11, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     May. 13, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 21   Yea 40,   Nay 1,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 19   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.546     Amend. No.708   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 17, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 09, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Apr 10, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 13, 2009

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 20, 2009

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 546.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2009

Apr 22, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 18, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 708.) To printer.

May 19, 2009

May 20, 2009

  • In Assembly.

May 21, 2009

  • Senate Amendment No. 708 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 22, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 305.
  • Effective July 1, 2009, and expires by limitation June 30, 2013.